EP2700759 - Inlet fitting for a cistern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüdisser, Martin Erlenstrasse 103 8645 Jona / CH | 02 /
Wey, Paul Büel 2 8733 Eschenbach / CH | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12181530.2 | 23.08.2012 | [2014/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2700759 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/32, E03D9/14 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
E03D1/32 (EP);
E03D9/14 (EP);
E03D2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einlaufgarnitur für einen Spülkasten | [2014/09] | English: | Inlet fitting for a cistern | [2014/09] | French: | Garniture d'entrée pour une chasse d'eau | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2250867 (NICOLAS JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2339714 (PORCHER ETS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7039449U (RUCK, REINHOLD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1956152 (WIRQUIN PLASTIQUES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1323875 |