EP2527048 - Method for producing thin layers and corresponding layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vissing, Klaus-Dieter Alte Dorfstraße 10 27321 Thedinghausen (Morsum) / DE | 02 /
Ott, Matthias Fischteichenweg 26 21255 Dohren / DE | 03 /
Dölle, Christopher Cramerstraße 106 27749 Delmenhorst / DE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/48] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12181651.6 | 30.04.2008 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | DE20071020655 | 30.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007020655 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2527048 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2527048 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2527048 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/14, B05D3/00, B05D3/06, // B05D5/08 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
B05D3/145 (EP,US);
B05D3/06 (EP,US);
B05D5/08 (EP,US);
B05D2202/00 (EP,US);
B05D2202/25 (EP,US);
B05D2203/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2012/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen dünner Schichten und entsprechende Schicht | [2012/48] | English: | Method for producing thin layers and corresponding layers | [2012/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de couches minces et couche mince obtenue par ce procédé | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08749932.3 / EP2144714 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080749932) is 20.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2008 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | AT | 30.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | IE | 30.04.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | LU | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
AT | 30.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
LU | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0588038 (HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 8-16,30-35,45-49 * * page 3, lines 6,7,29-36 * * example 1 * * claims 1-3 *; | [XI]DE29606258U (HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,13,17 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,2,4,5 * [I] 8,10-12,14,15,18,21,22; | [X]DE102004061983 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,16,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] - [0015] - [0038] * * claims 1-3,5,6,29 *; | [XD]DE102005026359 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [XD] 17 * page 2, paragraphs 1,2,4,5 * * page 3, paragraphs 9,14 - page 4, paragraph 18 * * page 5, paragraph 22 - page 6, paragraph 40 * * example 1 * * tables 1-3 ** claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]WO2007017488 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 1, lines 5-10,16 * * page 2, lines 4-10,26 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 19 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, lines 15-27 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 32 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-4,6,7 * | by applicant | CH675178 | CH676168 | DE4019539 | DE4230149 | WO9634700 | JPH1135713 | DE19756790 | EP1027169 | DE19916474 | DE19961632 | DE10034737 | WO03002269 | DE10131156 | EP1301286 | WO2005049699 | DE10353530 | DE10353756 | EP0894029 | DE102004026479 | DE102005046233 | DE19957034 | US7128559 | DE102006018491 | - KITAMURA, M ET AL., "A practical high power excimer-lamp excited by a microwave discharge", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 79/80, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-4332(94)90463-4, pages 507 - 513, XP025861794 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-4332(94)90463-4 | - U. KOGELSCHATZ, "Dielectric-barrier Discharges: Their History, Discharge Physics, and Industrial Applications", PLASMA CHEM. AND PLASMA PROC., (2003), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1022470901385, pages 1 - 46, XP055163713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1022470901385 | - HORN, M.W. ET AL., "Plasma-deposited organosilicon thin films as dry resists for deep ultraviolet lithography", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL. B, (199011), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1116/1.585103, XP000359053 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.585103 | - MEHNERT, R. ET AL., "Funktionelle Schichten durch UV- und Elektronenstrahlhärtung", MAT.-WISS. U. WERKSTOFFTECH, (2001), vol. 32, pages 774 - 780 | - AWATSU, K.; ONOKI, 1., "Photo induced synthesis of amorphous Si02 with tetrametoxilane", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (19960722), vol. 69, no. 4 | - GRAUBNER, V. ET AL., "Wettability and surface composition of poly(dimethylsiloxane) irradiated at 172 nm", POLYMERIC MATERIALS: SCIENCE & ENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 88, page 488 | - W.C. OLIVER; G.M. PHARR, "Berkovich Indentor, Verfahren von Oliver & Pharr", J. MATER. RES., (1992), vol. 7, no. 6, page 1564 | - K. . SCHIFFMANN; R. L.A. KÜSTER, Z. METALLKUNDE, (2004), vol. 95, page 311 | - BERND LOECHEL, "Providing a Direct-LIGA Service - A Status Report", ANWENDERZENTRUM MIKROTECHNIK - BESSY | - M. COLBURN ET AL., "Step and Flash Imprint Lithography: A New Approach to High-Resolution Printing", PROC. SPIE, (1999), doi:doi:10.1117/12.351155, page 379, XP008011830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.351155 | WO2004EP13035 | WO2006EP62987 |