EP2584492 - Recognition of the street lighting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarzenberg, Gregor Hengstettersteige 16 75365 Calw / DE | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 12181731.6 | 24.08.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | DE20111084613 | 17.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084613 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584492 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584492 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
G06V20/584 (EP,US);
G06V10/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erkennen einer Strassenbeleuchtung | [2013/17] | English: | Recognition of the street lighting | [2013/17] | French: | Reconnaissance de l'éclairage des rues | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2012 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]US5837994 (STAM JOSEPH SCOTT [US], et al) [ID] 1,2,4,7-10 * column 5, line 18 - line 46 * * column 10, line 20 - line 41 * [A] 3,5,6; | [A]JP2000180378 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005152581 (HOKI KENTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [IA]DE102006055904 (ADC AUTOMOTIVE DIST CONTROL [DE]) [I] 1,7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * [A] 2-6,8-10; | [IA]US2008129541 (LU YUESHENG [US], et al) [I] 1,3,5-7,9,10 * figures 4, 5a, 6, 7 und 8 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 2,4,8 | by applicant | US5837994 |