EP2703042 - RF hyperthermia device for personalized treatment and diagnosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XAX Kft. Gyopár köz 5 2071 Páty / HU | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szász, Andras Ibolya u. 2 2071 Páty / HU | 02 /
Szász, Olivér Ibolya u. 2 2071 Páty / HU | 03 /
Iluri, Nora Shannon Road 15403 Los Gatos, CA California 95032 / US | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12181833.0 | 27.08.2012 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2703042 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
A61N1/403 (EP,RU,US);
A61B5/05 (RU,US);
A61B5/483 (RU,US);
A61B5/4836 (EP,RU,US);
A61N5/025 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HF-Hyperthermievorrichtung für personalisierte Behandlung und Diagnose | [2014/10] | English: | RF hyperthermia device for personalized treatment and diagnosis | [2014/10] | French: | Dispositif d'hyperthermie RF pour diagnostic et traitement personnalisé | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010043372 (ONCOTHERM KFT [HU], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 41 - page 44; figure 7 * * page 17 - page 18 * * page 46, lines 1-10 *; | [X]US4712559 (TURNER PAUL F [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 12, lines 30-40; figures 1,5,7 *; | [A]WO9749453 (SLUIJTER MENNO E [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1916013 (ONCOTHERM KFT [HU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004230263 |