EP2564787 - A method and apparatus for adjusting a field of view for exposure of an X-ray system, and an X-ray system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Jian Da Xing District Yi Zhuang Beijing / CN | 02 /
Ye, Bin Da Xing District Yi Zhuang Beijing / CN | 03 /
Huang, Yannan Beijing BDA YUJinXiangShe 13-B-401 100176 Beijing / CN | 04 /
Han, Yonghui Beijing BDA YUJinXiangShe 13-B-401 100176 Beijing / CN | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2017/03] |
Former [2013/10] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12181963.5 | 28.08.2012 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | CN201110289147 | 31.08.2011 Original published format: CN201110289147 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564787 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564787 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/06, A61B6/08 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/52 (US);
A61B6/08 (EP,US);
A61B6/469 (EP,US);
A61B6/4021 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2013/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anpassung eines Sichtfeldes zur Belichtung eines Röntgensystems und Röntgensystem | [2013/10] | English: | A method and apparatus for adjusting a field of view for exposure of an X-ray system, and an X-ray system | [2013/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil permettant de régler un champ de vision pour l'exposition d'un système à rayons X et système à rayons X | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2012 | AL | 18.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | NO | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 28.08.2017 | LU | 28.08.2017 | MT | 28.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
MT | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
MT | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
MT | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.08.2012 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
MT | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
MT | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
NO | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002118280 (MEDLAR DONAL [DE], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] *; | [X]US2004082852 (CHEREK DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [X]US2009232271 (SENDAI TOMONARI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0178] *; | [X]DE102009051897 (COPF FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] ** paragraph [0047] * | Examination | US2008037708 |