EP2704273 - Control and signaling device to be mounted in the mounting bore of a mounting plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faurie, Jean Jacques Alexanderstr. 36 90459 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Graf, Hans-Jürgen Oberschalkenbach 12 92256 Hahnbach / DE | [2014/10] | Application number, filing date | 12182207.6 | 29.08.2012 | [2014/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2704273 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2704273 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/044, // H01H3/02 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
H01H3/022 (EP);
H02B1/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2014/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Befehls- und Meldegerät zur montage in eine Montagebohrung einer Montageplatte | [2014/10] | English: | Control and signaling device to be mounted in the mounting bore of a mounting plate | [2014/10] | French: | Dispositif de commande et de signalisation destiné à être monté dans l'orifice de montage d'une plaque de montage | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 06.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2012 | AL | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | MT | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | RS | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | GB | 29.08.2016 | IE | 29.08.2016 | LU | 29.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
GB | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
GB | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
GB | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
GB | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0460729 (CGE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,9-13 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1407360 (KREEB R RAFI RAIMUND FINSTERHO) [X] 1,9-13 * figures 1,2,7 *; | [X]DE10330853 (WEG IND S A [BR]) [X] 1,9-13 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [AD]EP0683931 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 2-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3709970 | DE10034253 | EP0683931 |