Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8648375 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2014 | B2 | US2013313581 | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012120547 | 28.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5837456B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2015 | B2 | JP2013247269 | 09.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012120547 | 28.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2669964 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | A3 | EP2669964 | 04.12.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2012120547 | 28.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI493758B | 21.07.2015 | B | TW201349571 | 01.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012120547 | 28.05.2012 |