EP2662926 - Communication device and MIMO (Multi-Input Multi-Output) antenna system therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acer Incorporated 8F, No. 88, Sec. 1 Hsin Tai Wu Road Hsichih Taipei Hsien 221 / TW | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Kin-Lu National Sun Yat-sen University No. 70 Lianhai Rd. Gushan Dist. 804 Kaohsiung City / TW | 02 /
Wu, Tsung-Ju National Sun Yat-sen University No. 70 Lianhai Rd. Gushan Dist. 804 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12182480.9 | 30.08.2012 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | TW20120116785 | 11.05.2012 Original published format: TW 101116785 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2662926 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2662926 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/48, H01Q1/52, H01Q21/28 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q1/521 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationsvorrichtung und MIMO-Antennensystem darin | [2013/46] | English: | Communication device and MIMO (Multi-Input Multi-Output) antenna system therein | [2013/46] | French: | Dispositif de communication et système d'antenne MIMO (multi-entrées et multi-sorties) dans celui-ci | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003022637 (HIROTA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 10,15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2004070543 (MASAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 10 * figure 4 *; | [XAY]US2006181468 (IGUCHI AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,13,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0007] * [A] 5,7,11,12 [Y] 10,15; | [XA]KR100932420B (UNIV DONGGUK IND ACAD COOP [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-14 * abstract * [A] 3,8-10; | [Y]US2010120379 (FUKAGAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15 * page 8; figures 13-14 *; | [A] - DONGHO KIM ET AL, "Design of a dual-band MIMO antenna for mobile WiMAX application", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20110201), vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.1002/mop.25689, ISSN 0895-2477, pages 410 - 414, XP055028060 [A] 9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mop.25689 |