EP2564708 - Powder composition comprising a saccharide and a stevia extract, and its manufacturing process and use in food and pharmacy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tereos France 11, rue Pasteur 02390 Origny Sainte Benoite / FR | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Tereos France 11, rue Pasteur 02390 Origny Sainte Benboite / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Emile Les Anciennes Euries Rue de Saint Didier 01700 Neyron / FR | [2016/21] |
Former [2013/10] | 01 /
Wong, Emile Les Anciennes Euries Rue de Saint Didier 01700 NEYRON / FR | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [2016/21] |
Former [2013/10] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12182483.3 | 30.08.2012 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | FR20110057640 | 30.08.2011 Original published format: FR 1157640 | [2013/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564708 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564708 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L29/30, A23L27/00, A23L27/30 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A23L27/36 (EP);
A23L21/12 (EP);
A23L27/31 (EP);
A23L27/33 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | A23L1/09, A23L1/22, A23L1/236 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2013/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Pulverförmige Zubereitung enthaltend ein Gluzid und ein Extrakt von Stevia, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Verwendung in Lebensmitteln und Arzneimitteln | [2013/10] | English: | Powder composition comprising a saccharide and a stevia extract, and its manufacturing process and use in food and pharmacy | [2013/10] | French: | Composition pulvérulente comprenant un glucide et un extrait de stevia, son procédé de fabrication et son application dans le domaine alimentaire et pharmaceutique | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 19.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, PT, GR, SE, RS, RO, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 19.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2012 | AL | 25.05.2016 | AT | 25.05.2016 | BG | 25.05.2016 | CY | 25.05.2016 | CZ | 25.05.2016 | DK | 25.05.2016 | EE | 25.05.2016 | ES | 25.05.2016 | FI | 25.05.2016 | HR | 25.05.2016 | IS | 25.05.2016 | IT | 25.05.2016 | LT | 25.05.2016 | LV | 25.05.2016 | MC | 25.05.2016 | MK | 25.05.2016 | MT | 25.05.2016 | NL | 25.05.2016 | PL | 25.05.2016 | RO | 25.05.2016 | RS | 25.05.2016 | SE | 25.05.2016 | SI | 25.05.2016 | SK | 25.05.2016 | SM | 25.05.2016 | TR | 25.05.2016 | NO | 25.08.2016 | GR | 26.08.2016 | GB | 30.08.2016 | IE | 30.08.2016 | LU | 30.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | PT | 26.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
BG | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IS | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
TR | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.08.2012 | |
AT | 25.05.2016 | ||
CY | 25.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
HR | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
MK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
GB | 30.08.2016 | ||
IE | 30.08.2016 | ||
LU | 30.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SI | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
MC | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 25.05.2016 | |
CZ | 25.05.2016 | ||
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
SM | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
PL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
SK | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 25.05.2016 | |
DK | 25.05.2016 | ||
EE | 25.05.2016 | ||
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RO | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 25.05.2016 | |
ES | 25.05.2016 | ||
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
IT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
SE | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
GR | 26.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 25.05.2016 | |
FI | 25.05.2016 | ||
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
LV | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
RS | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 25.05.2016 | |
LT | 25.05.2016 | ||
NL | 25.05.2016 | ||
NO | 25.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 25.05.2016 | |
NO | 25.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011059218 (CORLISS GLENN A [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0016] , [0036] , [0168] - [0171] * * paragraphs [0175] - [0176] * * claim 2 *; | [XAI]US2010015320 (KING THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-3,8,20 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0022] - [0029] - [0035] - [0047] * * claims 9-12 * [A] 4-6 [I] 9,10; | [XDAI]WO2010025158 (MERISANT COMPANY [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,7,8,20 * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0018] - [0021] - [0034] - [0037] - [0051] , [0054] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0067] , [0077] - [0079] * * examples 1-4 * [A] 11-19 [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2011195169 (MARKOSYAN AVETIK [MY], et al) [X] 1-4,7,20 * examples 10,18,20,21 * * claims 1,2 * [I] 5-9; | [AD]EP0334617 (TATE & LYLE PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-20 * page 2, lines 55-63 * * page 3, lines 17-34 * * examples 2,3,4,10 *; | [A]US2003031772 (ZEHNER LEE R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]EP2215914 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0037] , [0110] * | by applicant | EP0334617 | EP2215914 | WO2008049256 | WO2010025158 | WO2010000001 | US2011124587 | - LOBOV ET AL., AGRIC BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 55, no. 12, pages 2959 - 2965 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., BIOSCI BIOTECHNOL BIOCHEM, (1994), vol. 58, no. 9, pages 957 - 965 | - MATHLOUTHI M.; REISER P., SUCROSE: PROPERTIES AND APPLICATIONS, (1995), page 187 | - Pharmacopée Européenne |