EP2574930 - Method and biomarker for evaluating metastasis, and siRNA compound for inhibiting metastasis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Cheng Kung University No. 1, University Road Tainan City 701 / TW | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liao, Pao-Chi No. 1 University Road Tainan City 701 / TW | 02 /
Cheng, Hung-Chi 8F.-2, No.245, Shengxue Road Yongkang Dist. Tainan City 710 / TW | 03 /
Chang, Ying-Hwa 7F., No.108, Sec. 1 Jinshan S. Rd. Taipei City 100 / TW | 04 /
Lee, Shu-Hui No.9, Aly. 23, Ln. 105, Zhongzheng Rd. Hutatan Township Changhua County 503 / TW | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Rigby, Barbara Nicole Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Leathley, Anna Elisabeth Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12182622.6 | 31.08.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US201161530003P | 01.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161530003 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574930 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Biomarker zur Beurteilung von Metastasen, und siRNA-Verbindung zum Inhibieren von Metastasen | [2013/14] | English: | Method and biomarker for evaluating metastasis, and siRNA compound for inhibiting metastasis | [2013/14] | French: | Procédé et biomarqueur pour évaluer des métastases et composé d'ARNsi pour l'inhibition des métastases | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005061725 (MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 5, line 21 - line 37; table 1 * [Y] 13-15; | [Y]EP1752536 (RNAI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 13-15 * claims 1, 26, 31 *; | [ ] - "Human alpha-1-antitrypsin precursor DNA.", Geneseq, (20061214), Database accession no. AEL42107, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [XI] - NEJJARI MIMOUN ET AL, "Inhibition of proprotein convertases enhances cell migration and metastases development of human colon carcinoma cells in a rat model", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200406), vol. 164, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1925 - 1933, XP002691382 [X] 9-12 * abstract * * page 1925, column r, paragraph l * * page 1928, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1929, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1931, paragraph l * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9440(10)63753-4 | [XI] - B. FAYARD ET AL, "The Serine Protease Inhibitor Protease Nexin-1 Controls Mammary Cancer Metastasis through LRP-1-Mediated MMP-9 Expression", CANCER RESEARCH, (20090715), vol. 69, no. 14, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-4573, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5690 - 5698, XP055051936 [X] 9-12 * abstract * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-4573 | [XI] - NAGAHARA A ET AL, "SERPINE2 is a possible candidate promotor for lymph node metastasis in testicular cancer", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 391, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2009.12.105, ISSN 0006-291X, (20100122), pages 1641 - 1646, (20100121), XP026863420 [X] 9-12 * abstract * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.12.105 | [XI] - ARCHANA THAKUR ET AL, "Gene expression profiles in primary pancreatic tumors and metastatic lesions of Ela-c-myc transgenic mice", MOLECULAR CANCER, (20080101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-4598-7-11, ISSN 1476-4598, page 11, XP055051937 [X] 9-12 * abstract * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-7-11 | [XI] - PIERRE MICHAEL ET AL, "Meta-analysis of archived DNA microarrays identifies genes regulated by hypoxia and involved in a metastatic phenotype in cancer cells", BMC CANCER, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20100430), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2407-10-176, ISSN 1471-2407, page 176, XP021075015 [X] 9-12 * abstract * [I] 13-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-10-176 |