Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | |
26.07.2013 | Publication of search report | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
19.07.2013 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
19.07.2013 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 | Change - inventor | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.05.2013 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
23.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
21.09.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |