EP2584049 - Gene expression markers for Crohn's disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abbas, Alexander R. 2164 Carmelita Drive San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
Clark, Hilary 1504 Noe Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
Diehl, Lauri 1460 Hollidale Court Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 04 /
Lees, Charles 4 Lion Well Wynd Linlithgow West Lothian DEH49 7EL / GB | 05 /
Noble, Colin L. Dunkeld House 372 Ferry Road Edinburgh Midlothian EH5 3QF / GB | 06 /
Satsangi, Jack 10a Tipperlinn Road Edinburgh Midlothian EH10 5ET / GB | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Woolley, Lindsey Claire Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Woolley, Lindsey Claire Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12182666.3 | 19.07.2010 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | US20090227049P | 20.07.2009 Original published format: US 227049 P | US20100302084P | 05.02.2010 Original published format: US 302084 P | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584049 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584049 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Genexpressionsmarker für Morbus Crohn | [2013/17] | English: | Gene expression markers for Crohn's disease | [2013/17] | French: | Marqueurs d'expression génétique pour la maladie de Crohn | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 26.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10737186.6 / EP2456890 | Divisional application(s) | EP13176212.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 13.08.2013 | EP13176946.5 / EP2757160 | EP14172415.3 Application withdrawn : 07.05.2015 | EP15166478.6 Application refused : 31.01.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor | 16.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2008014400 (GENIZON BIOSCIENCES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12 * the whole document * * see specifically the claim 37ff., table 4, and Fig.3 * [Y] 13-15; | [X]WO2009073565 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-15 * the whole document * * see especially the claims, as well as page 101, lines 33-34 *; | [Y]WO2008079406 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008147900 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2006063133 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008147869 (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - RIOUX J D ET AL., "Genome-wide association study identifies new susceptibility loci for Crohn disease and implicates autophagy in disease pathogenesis", NATURE GENETICS, (200705), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 596 - 604, XP002691805 [X] 1,2,5-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG2032 | [X] - HUETT A ET AL., "IRGM gene function is all about expression", AUTOPHAGY, (20090101), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 96 - 99, XP002691806 [X] 1,2,5-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/auto.5.1.7263 | [A] - LAWRANCE I C ET AL, "Ulcerative colitis and Crohn's disease: distinctive gene expression profiles and novel susceptibility candidate genes", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (20010301), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1093/HMG/10.5.445, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 445 - 456, XP002501364 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/10.5.445 | [A] - DANESE S ET AL, "Chemokines in inflammatory bowel disease", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, BMJ PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20050101), vol. 58, ISSN 0021-9746, pages 1025 - 1027, XP002601767 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * see especially Fig.3 * | by applicant | WO03056012 | WO03064621 | US4816567 | EP0404097 | WO9311161 | US2005048542 | US6283761 | US5461033 | US5952295 | US4275149 | US4737456 | US4318980 | US4376110 | US5591669 | US5589369 | US5545807 | US5565332 | US5573905 | US5567610 | US5229275 | WO9316185 | US5571894 | US5587458 | US5641870 | WO9308829 | WO9404690 | US5731168 | US4676980 | WO9100360 | WO9220373 | EP0003089 | US2002004587 | - BONEN; CHO, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2003), vol. 124, pages 521 - 536 | - GAYA ET AL., LANCET, (2006), vol. 367, pages 1271 - 1284 | - TRUELOVE S.C.; WITTS, L.J., BR MED J., (1955), vol. 2, pages 1041 - 1048 | - LENNARD-JONES JE., SCAND J GASTROENTEROL, (1989), vol. 170, pages 2 - 6 | - WALMSLEY, GUT, (1998), vol. 43, pages 29 - 32 | - RIOUX ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (2000), vol. 66, pages 1863 - 1870 | - STOKKERS ET AL., GUT, (1999), vol. 45, pages 395 - 401 | - VAN HEEL ET AL., HUM MOL GENET., (2004), vol. 13, pages 763 - 770 | - PARKES ET AL., AM J HUM GENET, (2000), vol. 67, pages 1605 - 1610 | - SATSANGI ET AL., NAT GENET., (1996), vol. 14, pages 199 - 202 | - GIALLOURAKIS, AM J. HUM GENET., (2003), vol. 73, pages 205 - 211 | - PALMIERI, ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER., (2006), vol. 23, pages 497 - 506 | - RUSSELL, GUT, (2006), vol. 55, pages 1114 - 1123 | - WALLER, GUT, (2006), vol. 55, pages 809 - 814 | - SATSANGI, NAT GENET., (1996), vol. 14, pages 199 - 202 | - BRANT, AM J HUM GENET., (2003), vol. 73, pages 1282 - 1292 | - HO, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 128, pages 288 - 296 | - STOUGHTON, ANNU REV BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 74, pages 53 - 82 | - HELLER, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1997), vol. 94, pages 2150 - 2155 | - DIECKGRAEFE, PHYSIOL GENOMICS., (2000), vol. 4, pages 1 - 11 | - LAWRANCE, HUM MOL GENET, (2001), vol. 10, pages 445 - 456 | - HUGOT ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 599 - 603 | - OGURA ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 603 - 606 | - YAMAZAKI ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2005), vol. 14, pages 3499 - 3506 | - DUERR ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 314, pages 1461 - 1463 | - "The Wellcome Trust Case Control Consortium", NATURE, (2007), vol. 447, pages 661 - 678 | - BARRETT ET AL., NAT GENET, (200808), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 955 - 62 | - HUGOT ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, no. 6837, pages 599 - 603 | - OGURA ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, no. 6837, pages 603 - 6 | - DUERR ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 314, no. 5804, pages 1461 - 3 | - MALOY ET AL., MUCOSAL IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 339 - 49 | - NOBLE ET AL., GUT, (200810), vol. 57, no. 10, pages 1398 - 405 | - STROBER ET AL., J.CLIN.INVEST, (2007), vol. 117, no. 3, pages 514 - 21 | - ABBAS ET AL., GENES IMMUN, (2005), vol. 6, pages 319 - 331 | - LANGMANN, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 127, pages 26 - 40 | - COSTELLO, PLOS MED., (2005), vol. 2, page E199 | - OKAHARA ET AL., ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER., (2005), vol. 21, pages 1091 - 1097 | - ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER., (2005), vol. 21, pages 109 - 120 | - SHI Y., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (2003), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 9 - 12 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - XU ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 13, pages 37 - 45 | - JOHNSON; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMAN PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 1 - 25 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, pages 446 - 448 | - SHERIFF ET AL., NATURE STRUCT. BIOL., (1996), vol. 3, pages 733 - 736 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - PLIICKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - MARKS ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - YELTON ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC. | - ST CLAIR JONES, HOSPITAL PHARMACIST, (200605), vol. 13, pages 161 - 166 | - SANDERSON ET AL., ARCH. DIS. CHILD., (1987), vol. 51, pages 123 - 7 | - GIAFER ET AL., LANCET, (1990), vol. 335, pages 816 - 9 | - BEATTIE ET AL., ALIMENT. PHARMACOL. THER., (1994), vol. 8, pages 1 - 6 | - PARKER; BARNES, METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 106, pages 247 - 283 | - HOD, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 852 - 854 | - WEIS ET AL., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (1992), vol. 8, pages 263 - 264 | - VELCULESCU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 484 - 487 | - VELCULESCU ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 88, pages 243 - 51 | - BRENNER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages 630 - 634 | - HELD ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - KENT, W.J., GENOME RES., (2002), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 656 - 64 | - "Primer3 on the WWW for general users and for biologist programmers", STEVE ROZEN; HELEN J. SKALETSKY, Bioinformatics Methods and Protocols: Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2000), pages 365 - 386 | - "General Concepts for PCR Primer Design", DIEFFENBACH, C.W. ET AL., PCR Primer, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1995), pages 133 - 155 | - "Optimization of PCRs", INNIS; GELFAND, PCR Protocols, A Guide to Methods and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1994), pages 5 - 11 | - PLASTERER, T.N., "Primerselect: Primer and probe design", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 70, pages 520 - 527 | - LIANG; PARDEE, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, pages 967 - 971 | - KAWAMOTO ET AL., GENOME RES., (1999), vol. 12, pages 1305 - 1312 | - FERGUSON ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 72, page 5618 | - YANG ET AL., GENOME RES., (2001), vol. 1, pages 1888 - 1898 | - FUKUMURA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS. RES., (2003), vol. 31, no. 16, page E94 | - SCHENA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 2, pages 106 - 149 | - VELCULESCU ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 88, pages 243 - 5 1 | - DING; CANTOR, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 3059 - 3064 | - GODFREY ET AL., J. MOLEC. DIAGNOSTICS, (2000), vol. 2, pages 84 - 91 | - SPECHT ET AL., AM. J PATHOL., (2001), vol. 158, pages 419 - 29 | - RUPP; LOCKER, LAB INVEST., (1987), vol. 56, page A67 | - DE ANDRES ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1995), vol. 18, page 42044 | - COLIGEN ET AL., Current Protocols in Immunology, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1991), vol. 1, 2 | - "Methods for the Preparation of Enzyme-Antibody Conjugates for use in Enzyme Immunoassay", O'SULLIVAN ET AL., Methods in Enzym., ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 73, pages 147 - 166 | - ZOLA, Monoclonal Antibodies: A Manual of Techniques, CRC PRESS, INC., (1987), pages 147 - 158 | - HERMAN J.G. ET AL., "Methylation-specific PCR: a novel PCR assay for methylation status of CpG islands", PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA., (1996), vol. 93, pages 9821 - 9826 | - FROMMER M. ET AL., "A genomic sequencing protocol that yields a positive display of 5-methylcytosine residues in individual DNA strands", PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA., (1992), vol. 89, pages 1827 - 1831 | - CHEN C.M., "Methylation target array for rapid analysis of CpG island hypermethylation in multiple tissue genomes", AM. J. PATHOL., (2003), vol. 163, pages 37 - 45 | - PEARSON K.; LEE A., BIOMETRIKA, (1902), vol. 2, page 357 | - "General Concepts for PCR Primer Design", DIEFFENBACH, C.W ET AL., A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, NEW YORK, (1995), pages 133 - 155 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - KOZBOR, J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63 | - MUNSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, page 220 | - SKERRA ET AL., CURR. OPINION IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, pages 256 - 262 | - PLIICKTHUN, IMMUNOL. REVS., (1992), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNE., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553 | - JOHNSON, KEVIN S.; CHISWELL, DAVID J., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 564 - 571 | - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - MILLSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539 | - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659 | - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 210 | - KOSTELNY, J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368 | - TUTT ET AL., J 1MMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - A. L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, WORTH PUBLISHERS, (1975), pages 73 - 75 | - SANDS ET AL., INFLAMM BOWEL DIS., (2005), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 522 - S28 | - JOISHY ET AL., J PEDIATR GASTROENTEROL NUTR., (2008), vol. 48, no. 1, pages 48 - 54 | - HENRIKSEN ET AL., GUT, (2008), vol. 57, pages 1518 - 1523 | - STOREY ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 9440 - 9445 | - ABBAS ET AL., GENES IMMUN, (2005), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 319 - 31 | - DWINELL ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 120, no. 1, pages 49 - 59 | - LEE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 181, no. 9, pages 6536 - 45 | - YANG ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 113, no. 4, pages 1214 - 23 | - LEE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 181, no. 9, pages 6536 - 45 | - YANG ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOTY, (1997), vol. 113, no. 4, pages 1214 - 23 | - LAWRANCE ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2001), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 445 - 56 | - COSTELLO ET AL., PLOSMED, (2005), vol. 2, no. 8, page E199 | - MADSEN ET AL., BMC.BIOCHEM., (2007), vol. 8, no. 1, page S1 | - FAN ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1996), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 97 - 103 | - LEE ET AL., ONCOGENE, (20030501), vol. 22, no. 17, pages 2592 - 603 | - REN ET AL., J.BIOL.CHEM., (20060421), vol. 281, no. 16, pages 11413 - 21 | - ZHANG ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2006), vol. 25, no. 16, pages 2318 - 27 | - LUKASIAK ET AL., ONCOGENE, (20081009), vol. 27, no. 46, pages 6068 - 74 | - WEHKAMP ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, no. 50, pages 18129 - 34 | - SIMMS ET AL., GUT, (2008), vol. 57, no. 7, pages 903 - 10 | - GUTFELD ET AL., J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (2006), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 63 - 73 | - AL SHAMI ET AL., J EXP MED, (2005), vol. 202, no. 6, pages 829 - 39 | - ZAPH ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 446, no. 7135, pages 552 - 6 | - CHO ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2007), vol. 133, no. 4, pages 1327 - 39 | - SANDBORN ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2008), vol. 135, no. 4, pages 1130 - 41 | - LEES ET AL., INFLAMMATORY BOWL DISEASE MONITOR, (2009), vol. 19, no. 2 | - SANJUAN ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 450, no. 7173, pages 1253 - 7 | - PULESTON ET AL., ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER, (2005), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 109 - 20 | - BANKS ET AL., JPATHOL, (2003), vol. 199, no. 1, pages 28 - 35 | - KWON ET AL., GUT, (2002), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 818 - 26 | WO2001US10482 |