Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014116304 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | EP12190795 | 31.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2703718 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2016 | B1 | EP2703718 | 05.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | EP12190795 | 31.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103791509 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190795 | 31.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013248180B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2015 | B2 | AU2013248180 | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190795 | 31.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2830700 | 30.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190795 | 31.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014065560 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103672939 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013221908B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2015 | B2 | AU2013221908 | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2703717 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2016 | B1 | EP2703717 | 05.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2825440 | 03.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12182733 | 03.09.2012 |