EP2570491 - Susceptibility genes for age-related maculopathy (ARM) on chromosome 10q26 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center O'Hara & Thackeray Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorin, Michael B. 108 Glen Haven Lane Pittsburgh, PA 15620 / US | 02 /
Weeks, Daniel E. 6373 Douglas Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | 03 /
Conley, Yvette P. 221 Cool Springs Road White Oak, PA 15131 / US | 04 /
Ferrell, Robert 206 Maple Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15218 / US | 05 /
Jakobsdottir, Johanna Langamyri 24B Gardabaer IS-210 / IS | 06 /
Mah-Fraser, Tammy S. 10407-35 Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6J2M8 / CA | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 12182806.5 | 07.06.2006 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | US20050688572P | 08.06.2005 Original published format: US 688572 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570491 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
C12M1/34 (KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Suszeptibilitätsgene für altersbedingte Makulopathie auf Chromosom 10q26 | [2013/12] | English: | Susceptibility genes for age-related maculopathy (ARM) on chromosome 10q26 | [2013/12] | French: | Gènes de prédisposition à une dégénérescence maculaire liée à l'âge (DMLA) sur le chromosome 10q26 | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06772433.6 / EP1907576 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060772433) is 25.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0116364 (EVOTEC NEUROSCIENCES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13* page 14 - page 15 *; | [XI] - MATSUZAKI HAJIME ET AL, "GENOTYPING OVER 100,000 SNPS ON A PAIR OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ARRAYS", NATURE METHODS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20041101), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 109 - 111, XP009082656 [X] 10-12 * abstract * [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth718 | [XDYI] - WEEKS DANIEL E ET AL, "Age-related maculopathy: A genomewide scan with continued evidence of susceptibility loci within the 1q31, 10q26, and 17q25 regions", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (200408), vol. 75, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 174 - 189, XP002575505 [XD] 1,7 * abstract * * tables 1,3 * * page 186, paragraph bridging - page 187 * * page 179, paragraph bridging - page 182 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2-4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/422476 | [XYI] - IYENGAR S K ET AL, "Dissection of genomewide-scan data in extended families reveals a major locus and oligogenic susceptibility for age-related macular degeneration", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20040101), vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 20 - 39, XP002330730 [X] 1,7 * abstract * * table 2 * * page 22, column left, paragraph bridging - column r * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2-4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/380912 | [XYI] - Shannon J Kenealy ET AL, "Linkage analysis for age-related macular degeneration supports a gene on chromosome 10q26", Molecular Vision, (20040126), pages 57 - 61, URL: http://www.molvis.org/molvis/v10/a8/v10a8-kenealy.pdf, (20130201), XP055052003 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2-4,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9394(04)00176-X | [XYI] - SEDDON J M ET AL, "A Genomewide Scan for Age-Related Macular Degeneration Provides Evidence for Linkage to Several Chromosomal Regions", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20030101), vol. 73, doi:10.1086/378505, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 780 - 790, XP003025609 [X] 1 * table 3 * * page 785, column r * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2-4,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/378505 | [YD] - EDWARDS ALBERT O ET AL, "Complement factor H polymorphism and age-related macular degeneration", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20050310), vol. 308, no. 5720, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 421 - 424, XP002391908 [YD] 5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1110189 | [Y] - EDWARDS ALBERT O ET AL, "Complement factor H polymorphism and age-related macular degeneration - Supplementary online material", (20050310), SCIENCE, URL: http://www.sciencemag.org/cgi/data/1110189/DC1/1, (20100326), XP002575506 [Y] 5,6 * table S3 * | [XP] - JAKOBSDOTTIR JOHANNA ET AL, "Susceptibility genes for age-related maculopathy on chromosome 10q26", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20050901), vol. 77, no. 3, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 389 - 407, XP002419863 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/444437 | [AP] - DEWAN ANDREW ET AL, "HTRA1 promoter polymorphism in wet age-related macular degeneration", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20061101), vol. 314, no. 5801, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 989 - 992, XP002484959 [AP] 10-13 * page 991; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1133807 | [AP] - DEWAN ANDREW ET AL, "HTRA1 promoter polymorphism in wet age-related macular degeneration, Supporting online material.", (20061019), SCIENCE, URL: http://www.sciencemag.org/cgi/data/1133807/DC1/1, (20100326), XP002575507 [AP] 10-13 * page 1, paragraph 3rd full * | by applicant | - KLEIN ET AL., "Age-related macular degeneration. Clinical features in a large family and linkage to chromosome Iq", ARCHIVES OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1998), vol. 116, pages 1082 - 1088 | - WEEKS ET AL., "A full genome scan for age-related maculopathy", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2000), vol. 9, pages 1329 - 1349 | - MAJEWSKI ET AL., "Age-related macular degeneration--a genome scan in extended families", AM J HUM GENET, (2003), vol. 73, pages 540 - 550 | - SCHICK ET AL., "A whole-genome screen of a quantitative trait of age-related maculopathy in sibships from the Beaver Dam Eye Study", AM J HUM GENET, (2003), vol. 72, pages 1412 - 1424 | - SEDDON ET AL., "A genomewide scan for age-related macular degeneration provides evidence for linkage to several chromosomal regions", AM J HUM GENET, (2003), vol. 73, pages 780 - 790 | - ABECASIS ET AL., "Age-related macular degeneration: a high-resolution genome scan for susceptibility Loci in a population enriched for late-stage disease", AM J HUM GENET, (2004), vol. 74, pages 482 - 494 | - IYENGAR ET AL., "Dissection of genomewide-scan data in extended families reveals a major locus and oligogenic susceptibility for age-related macular degeneration", AM J HUM GENET, (2004), vol. 74, pages 20 - 39 | - KENEALY ET AL., "Linkage analysis for age-related macular degeneration supports a gene on chromosome 10q26", MOL VIS, (2004), vol. 10, pages 57 - 61 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., "Ordered subset linkage analysis supports a susceptibility locus for age-related macular degeneration on chromosome 16p12", BMC GENET, (2004), vol. 5, page 18 | - WEEKS ET AL., "Age-related maculopathy: a genomewide scan with continued evidence of susceptibility loci within the lq31,10q26, and 17q25 regions", AM J HUM GENET, (2004), vol. 75, pages 174 - 189 | - SANTANGELO ET AL., "A Discordant Sib-Pair Linkage Analysis of Age-Related Macular Degeneration", OPHTHALMIC GENETICS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 61 - 68 | - FISHER ET AL., "Meta-analysis of genome scans of age-related macular degeneration", HUM MOL GENET., (20050801), vol. 14, no. 15, pages 2257 - 64 | - EDWARDS ET AL., "Complement Factor H Polymorphism and Age-Related Macular Degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 421 - 424 | - HAINES ET AL., "Complement Factor H Variant Increases the Risk of Age-Related Macular Degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 419 - 421 | - KLEIN ET AL., "Complement Factor H Polymorphism in Age-Related Macular Degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 385 - 389 | - CONLEY ET AL., "Candidate gene analysis suggests a role for fatty acid biosynthesis and regulation of the complement system in the etiology of age-related maculopathy", HUM MOL GENET, (2005), vol. 14, pages 1991 - 2002 | - HAGEMAN ET AL., "From The Cover: A common haplotype in the complement regulatory gene factor H (HFl/CFH) predisposes individuals to age-related macular degeneration", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 7227 - 7232 | - ZAREPARSI ET AL., "Strong Association of the Y402H Variant in Complement Factor H at 1 q32 with Susceptibility to Age-Related Macular Degeneration", AM J HUM GENET, (2005), vol. 77, pages 149 - 53 | - HAGEMAN; MULLINS, "Molecular composition of drusen as related to substructural phenotype", MOLECULAR VISION, (1999), vol. 5, page 28 | - JOHNSON ET AL., "A potential role for immune complex pathogenesis in drusen formation", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 70, pages 441 - 449 | - DRUSEN, "formation and age related macular degeneration", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, vol. 73, pages 887 - 896 | - MULLINS ET AL., "Drusen associated with aging and age-related macular degeneration contain proteins common to extracellular deposits associated with atherosclerosis, elastosis, amyloidosis, and dense deposit disease", FASEB JOURNAL, (2000), vol. 14, pages 835 - 846 | - HAGEMAN ET AL., "An integrated hypothesis that considers drusen as biomarkers of immune-mediated processes at the RPE-Bruch's membrane interface in aging and age-related macular degeneration", PROGRESS IN RETINAL & EYE RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 20, pages 705 - 732 | - HAGEMAN, G.S. ET AL., "A common haplotype in the complement regulatory gene factor H (HF1/CFH) predisposes individuals to age-related macular degeneration", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20050503), vol. 102, no. 20, pages 7227 - 32 | - JAKOBSDOTTIR, J. ET AL., "Susceptibility genes for age-related maculopathy on chromosome 10q26", AM J HUM GENET., (2005), vol. 77, pages 389 - 407 | - O'CONNELL; WEEKS, "PedCheck: A program for identifying genotype incompatibilities in linkage analysis", AM J HUM GENET, (1998), vol. 63, pages 259 - 266 | - MUKHOPADHYAY ET AL., "Comparative study of multipoint methods for genotype error detection", HUM-HERED, (2004), vol. 58, pages 175 - 189 | - KONG ET AL., "A combined linkage-physical map of the human genome", AM J HUM GENET, (2004), vol. 75, pages 1143 - 1148 | - SCHAID ET AL., "Caution on pedigree haplotype inference with software that assumes linkage equilibrium", AM J HUM GENET, (2002), vol. 71, pages 992 - 995 | - HUANG ET AL., "Ignoring linkage disequilibrium among tightly linked markers induces false-positive evidence of linkage for affected sib pair analysis", AM J HUM GENET, (2004), vol. 75, pages 1106 - 1112 | - RINALDO ET AL., "Characterization of multilocus linkage disequilibrium", GENETIC EPIDEMIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 28, pages 193 - 206 | - BARRETT ET AL., "Haploview: analysis and visualization of LD and haplotype maps", BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, pages 263 - 265 | - GUDBJARTSSON ET AL., "Allegro, a new computer program for multipoint linkage analysis", NAT GENET, (2000), vol. 25, pages 12 - 13 | - BROWNING ET AL., "Case-Control single-marker and haplotypic association analysis of pedigree data", GENET EPIDOMIOL, (2005), vol. 28, pages 110 - 122 | - NORTH ET AL., "Application of logistic regression to case-control association studies involving two causative loci", HUM HERED, (2005), vol. 59, pages 79 - 87 | - DOWLER ET AL., "Identification ofpleckstrin-homology-domain-containing proteins with novel phosphoinositide-binding specificities", BIOCHEM J, (2000), vol. 351, pages 19 - 31 | - OKA ET AL., "HtrA1 serine protease inhibits signaling mediated by TGFfbeta family proteins", DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 131, pages 1041 - 1053 | - MURWANTOKO ET AL., "Binding of proteins to the PDZ domain regulates proteolytic activity of HtrAl serine protease", BIOCHEM J, (2004), vol. 381, pages 895 - 904 | - DE LUCA ET AL., "Pattern of expression of HtrAl during mouse development", J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (2004), vol. 52, pages 1609 - 1617 | - OKA ET AL., "HtrAl serine protease inhibits signaling mediated by Tgfbeta family proteins", DEVELOPMENT, (2004), vol. 131, pages 1041 - 1053 | - HOLLBOM ET AL., "Contrary effects of cytokines on mRNAs of cell cycle-and ECM-related proteins in hRPE cells in vitro", CURR EYE RES, (2004), vol. 28, pages 215 - 223 | - HARIBABU; SNYDERMAN, "Identification of additional members of human G-protein-coupled receptor kinase multi gene family", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 9398 - 9402 | - FAN; MALIK, "Toll-like receptor-4 (TLR4) signaling augments chemokine-induced neutrophil migration by modulating cell surrace expression or chemokine receptors", NAT MED, (2003), vol. 9, pages 315 - 321 | - ZAREPARSI ET AL., "Toll-like receptor 4 variant D299G is associated with susceptibility to age-related macular degeneration", HUM MOL GENET, (2005), vol. 12, pages 1449 - 55 | - MORATZ ET AL., "Regulation of chemokine-induced lymphocyte migration by RGS proteins", METHODS ENZYMOL, (2004), vol. 389, pages 15 - 32 | - SHI ET AL., "Toll-like receptor signaling alters the expression of regulator of G protein signaling proteins in dendritic cells: implications for G protein-coupled receptor signaling", J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 5175 - 5184 | - ESPARZA-GORDILLO ET AL., "Genetic and environmental factors influencing the human factor H plasma levels", IMMUNOGENETICS, (2004), vol. 56, pages 77 - 82 | - CORDELL ET AL., "Genetic association studies", LANCET, (2005), vol. 366, pages 1121 - 1131 | - HOWSON ET AL., "Comparison of population-and family-based methods for genetic association analysis in the presense of interacting loci", GENET EPIDEMIOL., (2005), vol. 29, pages 51 - 67 | - RISCH ET AL., "Implications of multilocus inheritance for gene-disease association studies", THEOR POPUL BIOL, (2001), vol. 60, pages 215 - 220 | - SEPP, T. ET AL., "Complement factor H variant Y402H is a major risk detriment for geographic atrophy and choroidal neovascularization in smokers and nonsmokers", INVEST OPHTHALINOL VIS SCI., (2006), vol. 47, pages 536 - 540 | - RIVERA ET AL., "Hypothetical LOC387715 is a second major susceptibility gene for age-related macular degeneration, contributing independently of complement factor H to disease risk", HUM MOL GENET., (2005), vol. 14, pages 3227 - 3236 | - SOUIED ET AL., "Y402H complement factor H polymorphism associated with exudative age-related macular degeneration in the French population", MOL VIS., (2005), vol. 11, pages 1135 - 1140 | - MAGNUSSON ET AL., "CFHY402H confers similar risk of soft drusen and both forms of advanced AMD.", PLOS MED, (2006), vol. 3, page E5 | - OKAMOTO ET AL., "Complement factor H polymorphisms in Japanese population with age-related macular degeneration", MO VIS., (2006), vol. 12, pages 156 - 158 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., "Cigarette smoking strongly modifies the association of LOC387715 and age-related macular degeneration", AIN J HUM GENET., (2006), vol. 78, pages 852 - 864 | - JAKOBSDOTTIR ET AL., "Susceptibility genes for age-related maculopathy on chromosome 10q26", AM J HUM GENET., (2005), vol. 77, pages 389 - 407 | - AYYAGARI ET AL., "Evaluation of the ELOVL4 gene in patients with age-related macular degeneration", OPTHALMIC GENET., (2001), vol. 22, pages 233 - 239 | - FRIED ET AL., "The Cardiovascular Health Study: design and rationale", ANN EPIDEMIOL., (1991), vol. 1, pages 263 - 276 | - CONTROL CLIN TRIALS., vol. 20, pages 573 - 600 | - KLEIN, R. ET AL., "Early age-related maculopathy in the cardiovascular health study", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2003), vol. 110, pages 25 - 33 | - "Age-Related Eye Disease Study Research Group (2000) Risk factors associated with age-related macular degeneration. A case-control study in the age-related eye disease study: Age-Related Eye Disease Study Report Number 3", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2000), vol. 107, pages 2224 - 2232 | - WEEKS ET AL., "Age-related maculopathy: a genomewide scan with continued evidence of susceptibility loci within the lq31, 10q26, and 17q25 regions", AM J JUM GENET., (2004), vol. 75, pages 174 - 189 | - VALDES, A.M.; THOMSON, G., "Detecting disease-predisposing variants: the haplotype method.", AM J HUM GENET., (1997), vol. 60, pages 703 - 716 | - LI H., "A permutation procedure for the haplotype method for identification of disease-predisposing variants", ANN HUM GENET., (2001), vol. 65, pages 189 - 196 | - NORTH, B.V.; CURTIS, D.; SHAM, P.C., "Application of logistic regression to case-control association studies involving two causative loci", HUM HERED., (2005), vol. 59, pages 79 - 87 | - KLAVER, C.C. ET AL., "Genetic association of apolipoprotein E with age-related macular degeneration", AM J HUM GENET., (1998), vol. 63, pages 200 - 206 | - SCHMIDT, S. ET AL., "Association of the apolipoprotein E gene with age-related macular degeneration: possible effect modification by family history, age, and gender", MOL VIS., (2000), vol. 6, pages 287 - 293 | - SCHMIDT, S. ET AL., "A pooled case-control study of the apolipoprotein E (APOE) gene in age-related maculopathy", OPHTHALMIC GENET., (2002), vol. 23, pages 209 - 223 | - BAIRD, P.N. ET AL., "The epsilon2 and epsilon4 alleles of the apolipoprotein gene are associated with age-related macular degeneration", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (2004), vol. 45, pages 1311 - 1315 | - ZAREPARSI, S. ET AL., "Association of apolipoprotein E alleles with susceptibility to age-related macular degeneration in a large cohort from a single center", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (2004), vol. 45, pages 1306 - 1310 | - DERSIMONIAN, R.; LAIRD, N., "Meta-analysis in clinical trials", CONTROL CLIN TRIALS., (1986), vol. 7, pages 177 - 188 | - VAN HOUWELINGEN, H.C.; ARENDS, L.R.; STIJNEN, T., "Advanced methods in meta-analysis: multivariate approach and meta-regression", STAT MED., (2002), vol. 21, pages 589 - 624 | - EDWARDS, A.O. ET AL., "Complement factor H polymorphism and age-related macular degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 421 - 424 | - HAINES, J.L., "Complement factor H variant increases the risk of age-related macular degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 419 - 421 | - KLEIN, R.J. ET AL., "Complement factor H polymorphism in age-related macular degeneration", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 385 - 389 | - CONLEY, Y.P. ET AL., "Candidate gene analysis suggests a role for fatty acid biosynthesis and regulation of the complement system in the etiology of age-related maculopathy", HUM MOL GENET., (2005), vol. 14, pages 1991 - 2002 | - ZAREPARSI, S. ET AL., "Strong association of the Y402H variant in complement factor H at 1 q32 with susceptibility to age-related macular degeneration", AM J HUM GENET., (2005), vol. 77, pages 149 - 153 | - SEPP, T. ET AL., "Complement factor H variant Y402H is a major risk determinant for geographic atrophy and choroidal neovascularization in smokers and nonsmokers", INVEST OPHTHAHNOL VIS SCI., (2006), vol. 47, pages 536 - 540 | - RIVERA, A. ET AL., "Hypothetical LOC387715 is a second major susceptibility gene for age-related macular degeneration, contributing independently of complement factor H to disease risk", HUM MOL GENET., (2005), vol. 14, pages 3227 - 3236 | - SOUIED, E.H. ET AL., "Y402H complement factor H polymorphism associated with exudative age-related macular degeneration in the French population", MOL VIS., (2005), vol. 11, pages 1135 - 1140 | - MAGNUSSON, K.P. ET AL., "CFH Y402H confers similar risk of soft drusen and both forms of advanced AMD", PLOS MED., (2006), vol. 3, page E5 | - VALDES, A.M.; THOMSON, G., "Detecting disease-predisposing variants: the haplotype method", AM J HUM GENET., (1997), vol. 60, pages 703 - 716 | - WEEKS, D.E. ET AL., "Age-related maculopathy: an expanded genome-wide scan with evidence of susceptibility loci within the lq3l and 17q25 regions", AM J OPHTHALMOL., (2001), vol. 132, pages 682 - 692 | - AREDS REPORT NO. 1. CONTROL CLIN TRIALS, vol. 20, pages 573 - 600 | - KLEIN, R.; KLEIN, B.E.; MARINO, E.K.; KULLER, L.H.; FURBERG, C.; BURKE, G.L.; HUBBARD, L.D., "Early age-related maculopathy in the cardiovascular health study", OPHTHAHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 110, pages 25 - 33 | - VAN LEEUWEN, R.; KLAVER, C.C.; VINGERLING, J.R.; HOFMAN, A.; DE JONG, P.T., "Epidemiology of age-related maculopathy: a review", EUR J EPIDEMIOL., (2003), vol. 18, pages 845 - 854 | - NORMAND, S.L., "Meta-analysis: formulating, evaluating, combining, and reporting", STAT MED., (1999), vol. 18, pages 321 - 359 | - LOHMUELLER, K.E.; PEARCE, C.L.; PIKE, M.; LANDER, E.S.; HIRSCHHORN, J.N., "Meta-analysis of genetic association studies supports a contribution of common variants to susceptibility to common disease", NAT GENET., (2003), vol. 33, pages 177 - 182 |