28.08.2020 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
13.08.2020 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
10.08.2020 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.04.2020 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
11.07.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
11.07.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
11.04.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
25.01.2017 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
16.01.2017 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
16.01.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
08.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
08.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
25.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
30.09.2016 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
15.06.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
01.10.2015 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
20.05.2015 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
17.04.2015 |
Opposition filed |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
13.06.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
11.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.03.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
15.03.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
14.12.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
08.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|