Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7807756 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2010 | B2 | US2007299214 | 27.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP20500 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5226217B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JPWO2006051798 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP20500 | 09.11.2005 | JP2006544903 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2546307 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2018 | B1 | EP2546307 | 17.04.2013 | A3 | EP2546307 | 16.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05806253 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1816168 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2011 | A4 | EP1816168 | 08.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP20500 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2546308 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B1 | EP2546308 | 17.04.2013 | A3 | EP2546308 | 16.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05806253 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101056945B | 13.04.2011 | B | CN101056945 | 17.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP20500 | 09.11.2005 | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006051798 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004325955 | 10.11.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1816168 |