EP2546308 - Curable composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2014/29] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuyu c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant 1-1, Torikainishi 5-chome SETTSU-SHI, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Noriko c/o Kaneka Corporation Takasago Plant, 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho TAKASAGO-SHI, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Toshihiko c/o Kaneka Corporation Takasago Plant, 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho TAKASAGO-SHI, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12183144.0 | 09.11.2005 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | JP20040325955 | 10.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004325955 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546308 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546308 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2546308 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/16, C08L75/08, C09J175/08, C08L101/10, C09J201/10, C08K5/57, C09K3/10 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C08L101/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/16 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C09J175/08 (EP,US);
C09J201/10 (EP,US);
C09K3/1018 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/16, C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/57, C08L71/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/03] | C08L101/10, C08K5/09, C08K5/17, C08K5/57, C09J201/10, C09K3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | Härtbare Zusammensetzung | [2013/03] | English: | Curable composition | [2013/03] | French: | Composition durcissable | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 15.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05806253.0 / EP1816168 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.2015
20.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.2015
20.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2015/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.2015
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 21.05.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.08.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/40] | Appeal following opposition | 16.01.2017 | Appeal received No. T0206/17 | 10.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.08.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2005 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | ES | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | IT | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IE | 09.11.2014 | LU | 09.11.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.11.2005 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.11.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
IT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
ES | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3971751 (ISAYAMA KATSUHIKO, et al) [A] 1-13* column 9, line 49 - line 50; claim - *; | [A]EP0210444 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 6, line 21 - line 22; claim - *; | [Y]EP0538881 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 6,10 * page 6, lines 1-4, 38-39; example 1; claim - *; | [XY]JPH0841358 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-5,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0040] , [0048] - [0051]; claim - * [Y] 6,10 | by applicant | JPS4612154B | US3278457 | US3278458 | US3278459 | US3427256 | US3427334 | US3427335 | JPS4627250B | US3632557 | US3711445 | JPS50156599 | JPS5273998 | US4067844 | JPS546096 | JPS5513767 | JPS5513468 | US4345053 | JPS57164123 | US4366307 | US4374237 | JPS5829818 | JPS58109529 | JPS5915336B | JPS5978223 | JPS59122541 | JPS59168014 | JPS60228516 | JPS60228517 | JPS61197631 | JPS61215623 | JPS61215622 | JPS61218632 | JPS6213430 | US4645816 | JPS636041 | JPS63112642 | JPS63254149 | JPS6422904 | JPH01168764 | JPH01197509 | JPH02129262 | US4960844 | JPH032450B | JPH0314068B | JPH0347825 | JPH0372527 | JPH03160053 | US5068304 | JPH048788 | JPH04173867 | JPH0455444B | JPH04283259 | JPH0469659B | JPH051225 | JPH0517521 | JPH0570531 | JPH05117519 | JPH06172631 | JPH06211922 | JPH06211879 | JPH06279693 | US5364955 | JPH0753882 | JPH07113073 | JPH07258534 | EP0676403 | JPH07108928B | JPH0853528 | JPH08231707 | JP2539445B | WO9705201 | JPH0953063 | JPH09194731 | JPH09272714 | JPH1053637 | EP0831108 | US5756751 | JPH10204144 | JPH10251618 | JPH10273512 | WO9847939 | JPH1160722 | JPH1160724 | JP2873395B | JPH11100427 | JPH11116763 | JPH11241029 | JPH11279249 | JPH11302527 | US5990257 | JPH11349916 | JP2000038560 | US6046270 | JP2000119365 | JP2000129126 | JP2000154368 | JP2000169544 | JP2000169545 | JP2000186176 | US6197912 | JP2001072854 | JP2001115142 | JP2001164237 | JP2001181532 | JP2001207157 | JP2001323040 | JP2002155145 | JP2002212415 | JP3313360B | JP2002249538 | JP2003508561 | WO03018658 | JP2003155389 | WO03059981 | JP2004051701 | JP2004066749 | WO2004022618 | JP4536319B | - J. P. KENNEDY ET AL., J. POLYMER SCI., POLYMER CHEM. ED., (1997), vol. 15, page 2843 | - MATYJASZEWSKI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, page 5614 |