EP2706301 - Heating system with solar heating means for domestic hot water and space heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morilleau, Nicolas 2 bis Avenue Ludovic Cormerais 44000 Nantes / FR | 02 /
Couraud, Christophe 12 ter rue Beauregard 44690 SAINT FIACRE SUR MAINE / FR | 03 /
Roger, Adrien 137 rue Jean Mermoz 44340 Bouguenais / FR | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Popp, Carsten, et al Vaillant GmbH IR-IP Berghauser Straße 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183351.1 | 06.09.2012 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706301 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2706301 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/08, F24D11/00, F24D17/00, F28D20/00, F24D19/10 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
F24D3/08 (EP);
F24H15/174 (EP,US);
F24D11/003 (EP);
F24D11/004 (EP);
F24D17/0068 (EP);
F24D19/1075 (EP,US);
F24H15/176 (EP,US);
F24H15/219 (EP,US);
F24H15/223 (EP,US);
F24H15/254 (EP,US);
F24H15/258 (EP,US);
F24H15/414 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | F24D3/08, F24D11/00, F24D17/00, F28D20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2014/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Heizungsanlage mit solarem Heizmittel zur Warmwasserbereitung und Raumbeheizung | [2014/11] | English: | Heating system with solar heating means for domestic hot water and space heating | [2014/11] | French: | Système de chauffage avec moyens de chauffage solaire pour de l'eau chaude domestique et chauffage d'espace | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2012 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | IE | 06.09.2018 | LU | 06.09.2018 | MT | 06.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.09.2012 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
MT | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
IE | 06.09.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
LU | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10212113 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 2-8,10-14; | [XY]EP1729071 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4 - column 8 * [Y] 9; | [X]EP2218972 (HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH]) [X] 1* column 2 - column 7 *; | [Y]WO2011078767 (FUELTECH SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [Y] 2-14 * page 7 - page 12; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | GB2431228 |