EP2571145 - Connection arrangement for windings of electric machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stallone, Francesco Via alla Morettina 24 6600 Locarno / CH | 02 /
Safari Zadeh, Hossein Högernweg 29 5504 Othmarsingen / CH | 03 /
Ballos, Konstantinos Geissfluhweg 12 5012 Schönenwerd / CH | 04 /
Haldemann, Johann Quellenstr. 31 5242 Birr / CH | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 12183496.4 | 07.09.2012 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | EP20110181096 | 13.09.2011 Original published format: EP 11181096 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2571145 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2571145 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2571145 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/50 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H02K3/505 (EP,US);
H02K2203/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2013/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsanordnung für Wicklungen von elektrischen Maschinen | [2013/12] | English: | Connection arrangement for windings of electric machines | [2013/12] | French: | Agencement de connexion pour enroulements de machines électriques | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 24.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2012 | AL | 02.08.2017 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | IT | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | IE | 07.09.2017 | LU | 07.09.2017 | MT | 07.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GB | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.09.2012 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GB | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
MT | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.09.2017 | ||
LU | 07.09.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
IT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61210852 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,5,11 * abstract *; | [A]US4943749 (PONCE HECTOR O [US], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * figures 1,2,3,6-8 *; | [A]EP2312730 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1,5,11 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1,9, *; | [XI]JP2009278848 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0012] , [0016] , [0017]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,3,7,12 | by applicant | US2007188030 |