EP2544475 - Methods and apparatus for use in processing disconnected emergency calls and other communications involving mobile communication devices and the remote monitoring thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/32] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIJAYANATHAN, Maiyuran 539 Wood Nettle Way Waterloo, ON N2V 2X9 / CA | 02 /
NAQVI, Noushad 617 Yarmouth Drive Waterloo, ON 2NK 4CT / CA | 03 /
WEIGELE, Ingo W. 600 Brookmill Crest Waterloo, ON N2V 2M2 / CA | [2020/32] |
Former [2013/02] | 01 /
Wijayanathan, Maiyuran 539 Wood Nettle Way Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2X9 / CA | ||
02 /
Naqvi, Noushad 617 Yarmouth Drive Waterloo, Ontario 2NK 4CT / CA | |||
03 /
Weigele, Ingo W. 600 Brookmill Crest Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2M2 / CA | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2020/32] |
Former [2013/02] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12183596.1 | 08.06.2007 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544475 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544475 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/51, H04W76/10, // H04M3/12, H04M3/22 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H04M3/5116 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP);
H04M3/12 (EP);
H04M3/2218 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | H04W4/22, H04W76/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwendung bei der Verarbeitung getrennter Notrufe und anderer Kommunikationen mithilfe mobiler Kommunikationsvorrichtungen sowie Fernüberwachung davon | [2013/02] | English: | Methods and apparatus for use in processing disconnected emergency calls and other communications involving mobile communication devices and the remote monitoring thereof | [2013/02] | French: | Procédés et appareil pour une utilisation dans le traitement d'appels d'urgence déconnectés et d'autres communications impliquant des dispositifs de communication mobiles et la surveillance à distance de celui-ci | [2013/02] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07109922.0 / EP2001253 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070109922) is 09.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2007 | AT | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | ES | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | IT | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | NL | 05.08.2020 | PL | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | SE | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.06.2007 | |
AT | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
IT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
NL | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
PL | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 05.08.2020 | |
ES | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
SE | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2339998 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 3 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0019744 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0049829 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 30 - page 5, line 32 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1124395 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] * |