EP2590173 - Mechanism for peak power management in a memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCombs, Edward M. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183706.6 | 10.09.2012 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | US201113286365 | 01.11.2011 Original published format: US201113286365 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2590173 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/18 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G11C8/18 (EP,US);
G11C7/10 (KR);
G11C7/22 (US);
G11C7/12 (US);
G11C8/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mechanismus für Spitzenleistungsverwaltung in einem Speicher | [2013/19] | English: | Mechanism for peak power management in a memory | [2013/19] | French: | Mécanisme de gestion de puissance de crête dans une mémoire | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 02.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |