EP2573141 - Silicone resin sheet, producing method thereof, encapsulating sheet, and light emitting diode device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitani, Munehisa c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Katayama, Hiroyuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/52] |
Former [2013/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12183862.7 | 11.09.2012 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | JP20110206291 | 21.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011206291 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573141 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2573141 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, H01L23/29, H01L33/56 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08J7/042 (KR);
B32B27/283 (KR);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08J7/08 (KR);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
H01L23/296 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08J2483/04 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/56, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | Silikonharzplatte, Herstellungsverfahren dafür, Verkapselungsblatt und lichtemittierende Diodenvorrichtung | [2013/13] | English: | Silicone resin sheet, producing method thereof, encapsulating sheet, and light emitting diode device | [2013/13] | French: | Feuille de résine de silicone, son procédé de production, feuille d'encapsulation et dispositif à diode électroluminescente | [2013/13] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 01.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2012 | AL | 24.12.2014 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | HR | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | MK | 24.12.2014 | MT | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | RS | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | SM | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | IE | 11.09.2015 | LU | 11.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 11.09.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PT | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.09.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 11.09.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2196503 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 32; claims 1-16; table 1 *; | [A]EP2365034 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-8 * | by applicant | JP2008291232 |