EP2708874 - Method of performing tomographic imaging of a sample in a charged-particle microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI COMPANY 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foord, David 537 SW Valeria View Drive no. 304 Portland, OR Oregon 97225 / US | 02 /
Schoenmakers, Remco Jagershei 16 5685 GE Best / NL | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Bakker, Hendrik FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 12184099.5 | 12.09.2012 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708874 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/225, H01J37/28 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
G01N23/046 (EP,US);
G01N23/2251 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (US);
H01J37/244 (EP,US);
H01J37/28 (EP,US);
G01N2223/419 (EP,US);
H01J2237/226 (EP,US);
H01J2237/24485 (US);
H01J2237/24585 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Durchführung von Tomographiebildgebung einer Probe in einem Mikroskop mit geladenen Teilchen | [2014/12] | English: | Method of performing tomographic imaging of a sample in a charged-particle microscope | [2014/12] | French: | Procédé permettant de réaliser une imagerie tomographique d'un échantillon dans un microscope à faisceau de particules chargées | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US8080791 (VON HARRACH HANNO SEBASTIAN [NL], et al) [YD] 3 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [XYI] - SAGHI Z ET AL, "Hybrid Tomography of Nanostructures in the Electron Microscope", SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS ELECTRON CRYSTALLOGRAPHY FOR MATERIALS RESEARCH AND QUANTITATIVE CHARACTERIZATION OF NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY WARRENDALE, PA, USA, (2009), vol. 1184, pages 139 - 144, XP002691620 [X] 1,2,6,8 * abstract * * Parts "HYBRID TOMOGRAPHY MODES" and "Combination of structural and spectroscopic tomography modes" * * figure 2 * [Y] 3 [I] 4,5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/PROC-1184-HH02-03 | [XI] - I. FLOREA ET ALL, "3D Analysis of the Morphology and Spatial Distribution of Nitrogen in Nitrogen-Doped Carbon Nanotubes by Energy-Filtered Transmission Electron Microscopy Tomography", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120522), vol. 134, pages 9672 - 9680, XP002691621 [X] 1,4,6,8 * abstract * * Part "Setup of EFTEM Tomography" * [I] 5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja304079d | by applicant | US2011278451 | US8080791 | - P. GILBERT, JOURNAL OF THEORETICAL BIOLOGY, (197207), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 105 - 117 |