EP2631527 - Lamp apparatus and luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nezu, Kenji c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Bokinge, Ole Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 12184168.8 | 13.09.2012 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | JP20120036107 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012036107 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631527 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21K99/00, F21S8/02, F21V3/04, F21V23/00, F21V29/00, F21V29/71, F21V29/77, F21V29/83, // F21Y101/02 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
F21V29/83 (EP,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21V29/508 (EP,US);
F21V29/713 (EP,US);
F21V29/773 (EP,US);
F21K9/238 (EP,US);
F21S8/026 (EP,US);
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21V23/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | F21K99/00, F21V29/00, // F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lampenvorrichtung und Leuchte | [2013/35] | English: | Lamp apparatus and luminaire | [2013/35] | French: | Appareil de lampe et luminaire | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2149742 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]); | [IY]EP2163808 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP2180249 (HYUNDAI TELECOMM CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]CN201748262U (ZHONGJIANG DONG); | [A]EP2320133 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2011187296 (NAGOYA SEISAKUSHO KK, et al); | [A]WO2012020830 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) |