Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
01.12.2015 | Change - representative | |
10.11.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.05.2015 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.05.2015 | Change - classification | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 | Change - classification | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
24.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.04.2015 | Change - classification | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
07.08.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
26.07.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant |