Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8736153 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2014 | B2 | US2013214665 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012036107 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5799850B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B2 | JP2013171768 | 02.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012036107 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2631527 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012036107 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN202852494U | 03.04.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2012036107 | 22.02.2012 |