EP2575174 - Semiconductor device and semiconductor-device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Kan c/o Sony Semiconductor Corporation 2-3-2 momochihama sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi 814-0001 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Keishi Sony Semiconductor Corporation 2-3-2 momochihama sawara-ku Fukuoka-shi 814-0001 / JP | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12184812.1 | 18.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | JP20110216930 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: JP 2011216930 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575174 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2575174 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/14636 (EP,US);
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9202 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/83 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauelements | [2013/14] | English: | Semiconductor device and semiconductor-device manufacturing method | [2013/14] | French: | Dispositif à semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication de dispositif à semi-conducteur | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 22.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]EP0558004 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [T] * column 1, lines 17-30 *; | [T]US6030895 (JOSHI RAJIV VASANT [US], et al) [T] * column 1, lines 20-29 *; | [A]EP2230691 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0042] - [0057] * * figures 3-11 *; | [I]US2011233702 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0110] - [0146] * * figures 4-13 *; | [XP]US2012086094 (WATANABE KAZUFUMI [JP]) [XP] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0059] , [0074] , [0 90] , [0122] - [0126] * * figure 15 *; | [XP]JP2012084693 (SONY CORP) [XP] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0031] , [0042] , [0054] , [0080] - [0088] * * figure 15 * | by applicant | JP2010245506 |