Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
19.07.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.02.2023 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.08.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.04.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.09.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.02.2021 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.10.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.10.2020 | First examination report | |
15.09.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.09.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.09.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.06.2018 | Change - applicant | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.09.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.02.2017 | Publication of search report | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 | Change - classification | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 | Change - classification | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
16.09.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.09.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
03.05.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |