Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2572907 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | B1 | EP2572907 | 03.04.2013 | A3 | EP2572907 | 27.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI20110326 | 26.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI123027B | 15.10.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | FI20110326 | 26.09.2011 |