EP2544073 - Image processing device, image processing method, recording medium, computer program, and semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohba, Akio c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0062 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Akira c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0062 / JP | 03 /
Kake, Tomokazu c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0062 / JP | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12185924.3 | 28.01.2005 | [2013/02] | Priority number, date | JP20040023013 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004023013 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2544073 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2544073 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544073 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/02] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungseinrichtung, bildverarbeitungsverfahren, aufzeichnungsmedium, computerprogramm und halbleiterbauelement | [2014/29] | English: | Image processing device, image processing method, recording medium, computer program, and semiconductor device | [2013/02] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'image, procede de traitement d'image, support d'enregistrement, programme informatique et composant semiconducteur | [2014/29] |
Former [2013/02] | Bildverarbeitungseinrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren, Aufzeichnungsmedium, Computerprogramm und Halbleiterbauelement | ||
Former [2013/02] | Dispositif de traitement d'image, procédé de traitement d'image, support d'enregistrement, programme informatique et composant semiconducteur | Examination procedure | 15.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05704389.5 / EP1710663 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050704389) is 14.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0872808 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 6* column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 10 *; | [A]US2002097247 (OHBA AKIO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2002196855 |