EP2581302 - Submarine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Marine Systems GmbH Werftstrasse 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Kai Bülowstr. 13 24105 Kiel / DE | 02 /
Thelen, Dipl.-Ing. Thorsten Feldweg 3 24340 Gammelby / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 12185954.0 | 25.09.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE20111084428 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084428 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581302 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581302 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B63B29/20, B63G8/34 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
B63B29/20 (EP);
B63G8/04 (KR);
B63B27/14 (KR);
B63B3/13 (KR);
B63G8/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | Unterseeboot | [2013/16] | English: | Submarine | [2013/16] | French: | Submersible | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2012 | AL | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | RS | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | IE | 25.09.2014 | LU | 25.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MK | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.09.2012 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 25.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB190904137 (SPEAR LAWRENCE YORK [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 22; figures 1-4 * |