EP2581270 - Insert for a dashboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stephan, Jörg Am Angelsdorn 83 50259 Pulheim / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Dörfler, Thomas Ford-Werke GmbH Abt. NH/364 Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50735 Köln / DE | [2015/22] |
Former [2013/16] | Dörfler, Thomas Ford-Werke GmbH Patentabteilung NH-364 Henry-Ford-Str. 1 50735 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186130.6 | 26.09.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE20111084500 | 14.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084500 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581270 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581270 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/06, B60R11/02 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
B60R11/02 (EP,RU,US);
B60R11/0241 (EP,US);
B60R7/06 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0005 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0075 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Einsatz für ein Armaturenbrett | [2013/16] | English: | Insert for a dashboard | [2013/16] | French: | Insert pour un tableau de bord | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 03.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees HU, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 02.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2012 | AL | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | RS | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IE | 26.09.2015 | LU | 26.09.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IE | 26.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.09.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2932442 (FAURECIA INTERIEUR IND [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 72, line 5 - page 8, line 9; figures 1-8; claims 1,7 *; | [AD]WO2009043367 (TOMTOM INT BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1 * figures 1,3-8; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE102006008420 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * figures 1-8 *; | [AD]EP2086794 (ADM CONCEPT [FR]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO2009127439 (FAURECIA INNENRAUM SYS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2,6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP2070768 (BURY SP ZOO [PL]) [A] 1-5 * figures 2-8 *; | [A]US7623958 (LAVERICK DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 19-27 * | by applicant | WO2009043367 | DE19817345 | DE102006008420 | EP2086794 |