EP2713497 - Power rectifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brünner, Siegfried Bachgassse 7 09244 Lichtenau / DE | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12186380.7 | 27.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713497 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/10 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H02M1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | H02M7/10, H02M7/155 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Netzgleichrichter | [2014/14] | English: | Power rectifier | [2014/14] | French: | Redresseur de secteur | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5661348 (BROWN ALAN E [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, paragraph 4 - column 6, paragraph 2; figure 4a *; | [A]EP1289105 (VLT CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4112907 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INFORMATIONSSYSTEME AG) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4414194 (NIEPENBERG DALEX WERKE [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4855890 (KAMMILLER NEIL [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |