EP2575373 - Digital television receiver with means for the efficient management of program services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TechniSat Digital GmbH Julius-Saxler-Strasse 3 54550 Daun / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Technisat Digital Gmbh Julius-Saxler-Str. 3 54550 Daun / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burmeister, Dipl.-Ing. Jens Gohliser Str. 24 01159 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Rother, Dipl.-Ing. Norman Zwickauer Str. 101 01187 Dresden / DE | [2013/14] | Application number, filing date | 12186601.6 | 28.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | DE20111083922 | 30.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011083922 | [2013/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575373 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/475, H04N21/482, // H04N21/84, H04N21/45 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04N21/4826 (EP);
H04N21/4755 (EP);
H04N21/4828 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Digitaler Fernsehempfänger mit Mitteln zur effizienten Verwaltung von Programmdiensten | [2013/14] | English: | Digital television receiver with means for the efficient management of program services | [2013/14] | French: | Récepteur de télévision numérique doté de moyens, destiné à gérer efficacement les services de programmes | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 04.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.07.2016 | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/40] | 28.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 28.07.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007209050 (FRALEU SEBASTIEN [FR]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0007] - [0046] *; | [A]WO9935841 (AMIGA DEV LLC [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 18 - page 3, line 6 * * page 7, line 17 - page 11, line 25 *; | [A]EP0721253 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 9, line 41 - column 12, line 41 *; | [A] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Specification for Service Information (SI) in DVB systems European Broadcasting Union Union Europà CR enne de Radio-Tà CR là CR vision EBUÂÜER; ETSI EN 300 468", ETSI STANDARD, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20080701), vol. BC, no. V1.8.1, XP014041882 [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [06.1] , [ 6.2.5] , [6.2.8] , [6.2.9] , [6.2.22] , [6.2.27] * |