|
20.11.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Amendments not yet acceptable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |