EP2545861 - Bladeless optical obturator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22872 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kahle, Henry c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 02 /
Strokosz, Arkadiusz A c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 03 /
McGinley, Kimball B c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 04 /
Taylor, Scott V c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 05 /
Johnson, Gary M c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 06 /
Brustad, John R c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12186717.0 | 01.10.2004 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | US20030508390P | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 508390 P | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2545861 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2545861 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2545861 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/34, // A61B19/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/3417 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (US);
A61B17/3421 (US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61B17/3496 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61B1/3132 (US);
A61B17/3462 (EP,US);
A61B17/3474 (EP,US);
A61B17/3478 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320044 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3425 (US);
A61B2017/3445 (US);
A61B2017/3456 (EP,US);
A61B2017/346 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/347 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/03] | Title | German: | Optischer Obturator ohne Klinge | [2013/03] | English: | Bladeless optical obturator | [2013/03] | French: | Obturateur optique sans lame | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04793965.7 / EP1670349 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040793965) is 23.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03026512 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US], et al) [A] 1 * pages 3,8,10 - pages 13,14; figures 1,2-11 *; | [A]US5817061 (GOODWIN MATTHEW S [US], et al) [A] 1 * columns 4,5; figure 2 *; | [A]US5738628 (SIEROCUK THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 40-54; figures 1,10,11 *; | [A]WO0018306 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * pages 5,27,28 - page 41; figures 1,2,13,15,27,32,35, *; | [A]US6228059 (ASTARITA DENIS C [US]) [A] 1 * column 2; figures 2,3,4,7 *; | [A]US4959067 (MULLER GEORGE H [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5562696 (NOBLES ANTHONY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 10,11,13 *; | [AP]WO03096879 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO9601074 (GEN SURGICAL INNOVATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,10-13,16 * pages 12,13 - pages 17,27; figures 1,13,17 * [I] 17,18; | [A]WO9411040 (KAALI STEVEN G [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0101847 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4607619 (SEIKE NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,8 *; | [A]WO0241795 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,7 *; | [A]US5865809 (MOENNING STEPHEN P [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5366446 (TAL ELISHA A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2002US06759 |