EP2574291 - Patella resection assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy (Ireland) Loughbeg Ringaskiddy County Cork / IE | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states DePuy (Ireland) Loughbeg Ringaskiddy County Cork / IE | ||
For all designated states Wright, Abraham P. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | |||
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | ||
For all designated states Wright, Abraham P. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Abraham P. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | 02 /
Choong, Peter S.M. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | 03 /
Randle, Raymond E. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/14] | 01 /
Wright, Abraham P. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | ||
02 /
Choong, Peter S.M. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | |||
03 /
Randle, Raymond E. DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana IN 46581 / US | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2013/14] | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12186730.3 | 28.09.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US201161540061P | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161540061 P | US201213548676 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US201213548676 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574291 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2574291 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/158 (EP,US);
A61B17/1767 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | Patellaresektionsanordnung | [2013/14] | English: | Patella resection assembly | [2013/14] | French: | Ensemble de résection rotulaire | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 18.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2012 | AL | 19.03.2014 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | RS | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | LU | 28.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003163137 (SMUCKER DONALD M [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US2004153066 (COON THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] ** figures 8-12 *; | [A]EP1723916 (DEPUY INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US7566335 (SCOTT JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 8 * * figures 3-6 * | by applicant | US2010168753 |