12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
23.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
14.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
29.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.11.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
11.10.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
11.10.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
08.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.04.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |