Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8998913 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2015 | B2 | US2013184712 | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213548676 | 13.07.2012 | US201161540061 | 28.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6005463B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | B2 | JP2013071013 | 22.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213548676 | 13.07.2012 | US201161540061 | 28.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2574291 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2014 | B1 | EP2574291 | 03.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213548676 | 13.07.2012 | US201161540061 | 28.09.2011 |