12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
30.09.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
23.10.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.03.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
27.03.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
21.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.10.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
26.04.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
09.04.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |