Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5769079B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B2 | JP2013085339 | 09.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011222506 | 07.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2579407 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B1 | EP2579407 | 19.11.2014 | A3 | EP2579407 | 10.04.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2011222506 | 07.10.2011 |