EP2578653 - Self-splitting splicing tape and dynamic splicing method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BK Chemical Co. Ltd. 2F., N°. 669, Daye Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yao, Being-Kung 2F., No. 669, Daye Rd., Beitou Dist. 112 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Wang, Pang-Yen 2F., No. 669, Daye Rd., Beitou Dist. 112 Taipei City / TW | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12187275.8 | 04.10.2012 | [2013/15] | Priority number, date | TW20110136030 | 05.10.2011 Original published format: TW 100136030 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2578653 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2578653 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
B32B2405/00 (EP,US);
C09J2203/342 (EP,US);
C09J2301/124 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1052 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2804 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sich selbst teilendes Spleißband und dynamisches Spleißverfahren damit | [2013/15] | English: | Self-splitting splicing tape and dynamic splicing method using the same | [2013/15] | French: | Bande d'épissage à division automatique et procédé d'épissage dynamique l'utilisant | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9425381 (KNP PAPIER BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * claim - * * figure 2 * [I] 8-14; | [AD]WO0224562 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract ** page 9, paragraph 4 * | by applicant | EP0941954 | WO0224562 | US2002056784 | US6432241 | US6488228 | US7152825 |