EP2584229 - O-ring shield system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gov, Ricky HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Friestad, Jr., Ronald J. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Zheng, Peter HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 12187974.6 | 10.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | US201113277882 | 20.10.2011 Original published format: US201113277882 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584229 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2584229 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/02, F16J15/32 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
F16L21/035 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | O-Ringabschirmungssystem und Verfahren | [2013/17] | English: | O-ring shield system and method | [2013/17] | French: | Système et procédé de blindage d'un joint torique | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2012 | AL | 29.01.2014 | AT | 29.01.2014 | BE | 29.01.2014 | BG | 29.01.2014 | CY | 29.01.2014 | CZ | 29.01.2014 | DK | 29.01.2014 | EE | 29.01.2014 | ES | 29.01.2014 | FI | 29.01.2014 | HR | 29.01.2014 | IT | 29.01.2014 | LT | 29.01.2014 | LV | 29.01.2014 | MC | 29.01.2014 | MK | 29.01.2014 | MT | 29.01.2014 | NL | 29.01.2014 | PL | 29.01.2014 | RO | 29.01.2014 | RS | 29.01.2014 | SE | 29.01.2014 | SI | 29.01.2014 | SK | 29.01.2014 | SM | 29.01.2014 | TR | 29.01.2014 | NO | 29.04.2014 | GR | 30.04.2014 | IS | 29.05.2014 | PT | 29.05.2014 | IE | 10.10.2014 | LU | 10.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.10.2012 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MK | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.10.2012 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
SM | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.10.2012 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
MT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.10.2012 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
IT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BE | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
HR | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RS | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
ES | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 29.01.2014 | |
NO | 29.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2214601 (ANDRE ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMI [GB]) [X] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [X]US7258371 (HAGEN HARALD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5169161 (JONES WILLIAM D [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3567233 (STEPANICH FRED C) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * |