Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
02.12.2019 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
29.10.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.08.2019 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
19.08.2019 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | |
19.08.2019 | Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
19.08.2019 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
21.07.2019 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
11.06.2019 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.02.2019 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
15.02.2019 | First examination report | |
31.10.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.10.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.10.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.04.2016 | Publication of search report | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 | Change - classification | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 | Change - classification | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
03.11.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.11.2013 | Change - representative | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
23.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
22.03.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |