EP2584480 - Associative memory technology for analysis of requests for proposal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, William G 2333 Acadie Drive Jacksonville, FL 32217 / US | 02 /
Warn, Brian 1117 NE 82nd Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 03 /
Whelan, John 2025 SW 163rd Court Burien, WA 98166 / US | 04 /
Flores, Jr, Jaime Antonio 12624 SE 300th Way Auburn, WA 98092 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 12188128.8 | 11.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | US201113277771 | 20.10.2011 Original published format: US201113277771 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584480 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584480 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q10/06 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G06F16/90339 (EP,US);
G06F16/22 (EP,US);
G06F16/285 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Assoziative Speichertechnologie zur Analyse von Anfragen für Vorschläge | [2013/17] | English: | Associative memory technology for analysis of requests for proposal | [2013/17] | French: | Technologie de mémoire associative pour l'analyse de requêtes de proposition | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/02] | 02.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2020 | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008250039 (FRANKS KASIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0095] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0127] * [I] 2-14; | [I] - CHISVIN L ET AL, "Content-addressable and associative memory: alternatives to the ubiquitous RAM", COMPUTER, IEEE, US, (19890701), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1109/2.30732, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 51 - 64, XP011436720 [I] 1-15 * pages 52-53 * * page 56, column r - page 57, column m * * figures 2-4, 6-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.30732 |