EP2719494 - Adaptive method for the opening of closed outlets of a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines GmbH Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisen, Markus Dr. Waldstraße 11 30163 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Magunia, Eckhart Fliederweg 8 26409 Wittmund / DE | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 12188323.5 | 12.10.2012 | [2014/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719494 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, F01D5/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP);
B23K26/389 (EP);
F01D5/186 (EP);
B23K2101/001 (EP);
F01D5/005 (EP);
F05D2230/13 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Adaptives Verfahren zum Öffnen von verschlossenen Durchlässen eines Bauteils | [2014/16] | English: | Adaptive method for the opening of closed outlets of a component | [2014/16] | French: | Procédé adaptatif pour ouvrir des passages fermés d'un composant | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/36] | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1767743 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * [I] 2,4,5; | [X]EP2093641 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2123788 (HUFFMAN CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |