EP2584281 - Hot water tank and pressure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burghardt, Stefan Westernach 2 83253 Rimsting / DE | 02 /
Englisch, Christian Bacherwinkl 2 83324 Ruhpolding / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12188370.6 | 12.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | DE20111084866 | 20.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084866 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584281 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584281 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2584281 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12, F16K31/122, F16K17/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
F16K31/1221 (EP);
F16K17/0473 (EP);
F16K17/24 (EP);
F16K31/1223 (EP);
F24H9/136 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | F24H9/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2013/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Warmwasserspeicher und Druckeinrichtung | [2013/17] | English: | Hot water tank and pressure device | [2013/17] | French: | Accumulateur d'eau chaude et dispositif de pression | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 21.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2012 | AL | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MK | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | RS | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | SM | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | IE | 12.10.2017 | LU | 12.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MK | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
SM | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RS | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE960942 (FRANZ SCHWAB) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 1; figure 1 * [A] 6,7; | [XI]DE2631319 (GIKEN CO) [X] 9,10 * pages 4-14; figures 5, 6 * [I] 1,4,5,8; | [X]WO9951902 (CONBRACO IND INC [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * pages 6-12; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP0916909 (CIRET GUY [FR]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figure 1 * |