EP2580982 - Hanging sunshade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states May Gerätebau GmbH Zum Mühlbach 1 88422 Betzenweiler / DE | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Karl-Heinz Pfarrgasse 6 88422 Betzenweiler / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2013/16] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12188378.9 | 12.10.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | DE201110115815 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011115815 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580982 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580982 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A45B23/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
A45B23/00 (EP,US);
A45B2023/0043 (US);
A45B2023/005 (EP,US);
A45B2023/0056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | Ampelschirm | [2013/16] | English: | Hanging sunshade | [2013/16] | French: | Parasol déporté | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 14.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2012 | AL | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | IE | 12.10.2015 | LU | 12.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.10.2012 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4606366 (COLLET JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-11 * column 12; figures 59-61 *; | [A]EP1627577 (BRUTSAERT TRADING BV MET BEPER [BE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figure - * |