EP2581918 - Gas blocking cable and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Wire & Cable LLC 107 North Fifth Street Saddle Brook, NJ 07663 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nadakal, Mathew J. c/o TE Wire & Cable LLC 107 North Fifth Street Saddle Brook, NJ 07663 / US | 02 /
Smith, Gregory J. c/o TE Wire & Cable LLC 107 North Fifth Street Saddle Brook, NJ 07663 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12188593.3 | 15.10.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | US201161547168P | 14.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161547168 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581918 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581918 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/29, H01B7/295, H01B13/24, H01B13/26, H01B7/285, H01B7/04 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
H01B13/24 (EP);
H01B7/285 (EP);
H01B7/292 (EP);
H01B7/295 (EP);
Y02A30/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gasblockierungskabel und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2013/16] | English: | Gas blocking cable and method of manufacturing | [2013/16] | French: | Câble de blocage de gaz et procédé de fabrication | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RS | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | IE | 15.10.2017 | LU | 15.10.2017 | MT | 15.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | CY | 20.09.2017 | |
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CY | 20.09.2017 | |
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 20.09.2017 | |
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | DK | 20.09.2017 | |
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | DK | 20.09.2017 | |
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 15.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 20.09.2017 | |
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
MT | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | DK | 20.09.2017 | |
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
LU | 15.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | DK | 20.09.2017 | |
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | EE | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RS | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4440974 (NAUDET JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-12,14 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,9,15; | [X]US3832481 (BOYD C, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,12,14,15 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, lines 41-65 * * column 3, lines 22-50 * * column 4, lines 1-9, 60-65 * * column 5, lines 17-30 * * column 6, lines 1-15 * | Examination | US2008302556 | by applicant | US4767182 |