EP2559622 - Apparatus for forming films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/08] | Method and apparatus for forming films | ||
[2016/08] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroese, Timothy Bernard William Kolveniersstraat 18 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02 /
Ruehl, Kenneth Leonard 1647 Millville Shandon Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | 03 /
Ben Moussa, Rachid Koedalstraat 52 3090 Overijse / BE | [2013/15] |
Former [2013/09] | 01 /
Kroese, Timothy Bernard William Kolveniersstraat 18 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
02 /
Ruehl, Kenneth Leonard 5411 Style Lane Cincinnati, OH 45238 / US | |||
03 /
Ben Moussa Rachid Via Abetone 1 65015 Montesilvano / IT | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2020/13] |
Former [2013/38] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2013/08] | Goodier, Claire-Louise N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 12188759.0 | 31.01.2002 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | US20010265462P | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 265462 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559622 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2559622 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2559622 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/04, B29C51/36, B29C51/10, B29C51/26 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
B65D85/808 (EP);
B31F5/02 (EP);
B65B41/12 (EP);
B65B47/10 (EP);
B65B9/042 (EP);
C11D17/003 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D17/042 (EP);
C11D17/046 (EP);
C11D3/3942 (EP);
B29C2791/006 (EP);
B29C51/10 (EP);
B29L2031/7128 (EP);
B29L2031/7148 (EP);
B31B70/10 (EP);
Y02W90/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2013/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bilden von Filmen | [2019/26] | English: | Apparatus for forming films | [2016/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil de formation de films | [2019/26] |
Former [2013/08] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bilden von Filmen | ||
Former [2013/08] | Method and apparatus for forming films | ||
Former [2013/08] | Procédé et appareil de formation de films | Examination procedure | 29.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02709274.1 / EP1358107 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020709274) is 22.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2017
30.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | 02
14.06.2017
20.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser Vanish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Cawdell, Karen Teresa Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | 03
12.06.2017
19.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Harro Höfliger Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Helmholtzstrasse 4 71573 Allmersbach im Tal / DE Opponent's representative Zurhorst, Stefan Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2017
30.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
02
14.06.2017
20.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser Vanish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | |||
03
12.06.2017
19.06.2017
ADMISSIBLE Harro Höfliger Verpackungsmaschinen GmbH Helmholtzstrasse 4 D-71573 Allmersbach im Tal / DE Opponent's representative Zurhorst, Stefan Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2017
30.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
02
14.06.2017
Reckitt Benckiser Vanish B.V. Siriusdreef 14 2132 WT Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Bowers, Craig Malcolm Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | |||
Former [2017/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative von Rohr, Hans Wilhelm von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | 19.07.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.11.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.09.2019 | Appeal received No. T2497/19 | 15.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | PT | 16.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | IE | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | LU | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
SE | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3218776 (CLOUD CHARLES E) [AD] 1,11 * column 2, line 35 - column 2, line 48 *; | [A]GB1019797 (M L SHELLEY AND PARTNERS LTD) [A] 1,12* page 1, line 50 - page 1, line 72 *; | [A]WO9217382 (RHONE POULENC AGRICULTURE [GB]) [A] 1,11 * page 15, line 9 - page 15, line 16 * | by applicant | US3218776 | Opposition | US3061984 | US3125839 | US3218776 | GB1019797 | DE1217845 | US3958394 | WO9217382 | WO0055069 | US4987728 | US5034077 | US5543439 | WO0055415 |